THE LYNSEY IVISON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give holidays to children with life threatening illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cambridgeshire
- City Of London
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Hertfordshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 July 1991: Standard registration
- 19 April 2021: Funds received from 1125473 KISSES4KIDS
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN IVISON | Chair | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
Craig Ivison | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAUREN IVISON | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY IVISON | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.31k | £2.21k | £21.90k | £4.37k | £9.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.48k | £9.65k | £11.15k | £13.91k | £36.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 August 2023 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH MAY 1990
Charitable objects
THE INCOME AND CAPITAL THEREOF TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, AND IN PARTICULAR IN FURTHERANCE AND FOR THE PROVISION OF RELIEF FOR THE SICK AND THOSE IN NEED, WITH POWER FOR THE TRUSTEES AT ANY TIME AND FROM TIME TO TIME TO DETERMINE WHETHER INCOME SHOULD BE ADDED TO CAPITAL AND WHAT PROPORTION OF THE TRUST FUND SHALL CONSTITUTE INCOME OR CAPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BRIDEWELL CLOSE
BUNTINGFORD
SG9 9AY
- Phone:
- 01763271878
- Email:
- ianivison@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
Lynseyivisontrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window