Accounts and annual returns WIRRAL OUTDOOR EDUCATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003416
Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Annual return 30 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Annual return 30 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2020 10 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2019 04 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Not Required