GLOBAL HEALTH FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees principally support the aims of the Holistic Health Foundation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 July 1991: Standard registration
- 30 September 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 30 September 2008: Funds transferred to 257951 THE BOLTONS TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.06k | £35.05k | £15.02k | £19 | £15.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.03k | £30.73k | £30.03k | £881 | £18.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 19 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 19 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 14 March 2008 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 05 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 27 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 27 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ITS EFFECTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (2) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT MEDICAL CARE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND THE RELIEF OF PAIN SUFFERING OR HARDSHIP CAUSED BY ANY FORM OF ILLNESS OR DISABILITY (3) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT RESEARCH IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window