GROUNDWORK FIVE COUNTIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are committed to improving quality of life for local people. We work with entire communities or discrete groups such as young people, BME's, school children and businesses to deliver changes to local environments, individual behaviour and sense of community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,400,140
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.39m | |
Other trading activities | £7.66k | |
Investments | £5.81k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,989,201
Raising funds | £5.12k | |
Charitable activities | £1.98m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £129,000 from 10 government contract(s) and £438,300 from 11 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.12k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.98m |
People

32 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
292 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 July 1991: Standard registration
- GROUNDWORK GREATER NOTTINGHAM (Working name)
- GREATER NOTTINGHAM GROUNDWORK TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Clarke | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Neil Alun Moon | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CLARKE | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Marc Blair Green | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed-El Amine Benkermi | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Mace | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darran Trute | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Edward Wright | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Adrian Court | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Ibell | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Skinner | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.28m | £3.24m | £3.07m | £4.62m | £1.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.30m | £3.19m | £3.17m | £4.73m | £1.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £49.54k | £49.55k | £72.22k | £1.68m | £129.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £291.06k | £29.38k | £488.46k | £318.96k | £438.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.50k | £29.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.97k | £1.55k | £5.63k | £13.77k | £7.66k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.27m | £3.21m | £3.06m | £4.60m | £1.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.49k | £2.20k | £620 | £1.52k | £5.81k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.22m | £3.13m | £3.12m | £4.72m | £1.98m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £79.58k | £54.10k | £45.12k | £13.04k | £5.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £73.80k | £41.29k | £33.84k | £21.34k | £58.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £17.82k | £12.59k | £29.47k | £20.21k | £17.84k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.35m | £982.28k | £1.17m | £884.31k | £304.08k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£801.00k | -£1.11m | -£945.00k | -£132.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £746.65k | £296.60k | £561.53k | £339.40k | £339.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 NOVEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 OCTOBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
3.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE TO; (I) PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT ANYWHERE IN THE AREAS OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND (II) PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE AREAS OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND (III) ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER AND (IV) PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE AREAS OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: (I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; (II) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY THOUGHT TO BE FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (IV) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORK SPACE, BUILDING AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (V) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; (VI) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (VII) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (VIII) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (IX) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (X) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; (XI) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
BROXTOWE GEDLING NOTTINGHAM RUSHCLIFFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Commerce Square
Lace Market
Nottingham
NG1 1HS
- Phone:
- 01159788212
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window