WELLESBOURNE WARTIME MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserve the history of Wellesbourne Mountford Airfield and its surrounds and maintain a collection of artifacts illustrating the life of the establishment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 July 1991: Standard registration
- WELLESBOURNE AVIATION GROUP (Previous name)
- Wellesbourne Wartime Museum (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D J POWELL | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.16k | £554 | £2.25k | £3.95k | £4.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.53k | £3.14k | £3.15k | £2.97k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1980 AS AMENDED 6 JANUARY 1990 AND 24 MARCH 1991 as amended on 17 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM FOR THE PUBLIC DISPLAY OF AIRCRAFT AND AERONAUTICAL EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS RELATING TO AVIATION AND AVIATION HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
167 COLEBOURNE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B13 0HB
- Phone:
- 01217773518
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window