WEST WALES DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support people and families who have dyslexia. Collect and provide information about dyslexia. Provide helpline. Organise public meetings with speakers. Call for better understanding of dyslexia in work and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 24 July 1991: Standard registration
- 06 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 August 2024: Funds transferred to 289243 THE BRITISH DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION
- CYMDEITHAS DDYSLECSIA GORLLEWIN CYMRUWWDA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116 | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £230 | £234 | £245 | £230 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 December 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS HANDICAPPED BY DYSLEXIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WEST WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window