ALL HEAR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 July 1991: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- ALL HEAR FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST. MAY 1990
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AT THE ROYAL SOUTH HAMPSHIRE HOSPITAL AND ANY OTHER HOSPITAL OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION IN THE SOUTHAMPTON AREA IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND STAFF TO ENABLE THE COCHLEAR IMPLANT PROGRAMME AT THE ROYAL SOUTH HAMPSHIRE HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON,HAMPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window