Governing document TRULL VILLAGE MEMORIAL HALL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/09/2000 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/2015 as amended on 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2022 as amended on 12 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL OR HALLS FOR THE USE BY THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TRULL ANDTHE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.