FUND FOR THE BLIND OF LASKI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF CARE TREATMENT AND TRAINING OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE IN POLAND UNDER THE CARE OF THE SOCIETY OF THE BLIND IN LASKI.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Poland
Governance
- 18 July 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TADEUSZ KRZYSZTOF POTWOROWSKI | Chair | 14 May 1991 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Dunin-Wasowicz | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA ZOLTOWSKA | Trustee | 31 May 1997 |
|
|
||||
PIOTR CHLAPOWSKI | Trustee | 14 May 1991 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.66k | £175.69k | £38.88k | £37.13k | £50.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.51k | £16.56k | £214.26k | £4.50k | £105.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14/05/1991 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF,CARE,TREATMENT AND TRAINING OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE IN POLAND UNDER THE CARE OF THE SOCIETY FOR THE CARE OF THE BLIND IN LASKI POLAND.
Area of benefit
POLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
COPPERFIELD
WAYSIDE GARDENS
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 7NG
- Phone:
- 01753889867
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window