Accounts and annual returns GUISELEY SENIOR CITIZENS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 March 2022 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required