Accounts and annual returns THE PHILIP ELLIOTT TRUST

Charity number: 1003556
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required