THE SCRAPTOFT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small Village with 6 regular Hall user and it is open for members of the public to use on a booking system
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 19 July 1991: Standard registration
- SCRAPTOFT VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- THE SCRAPTOFT INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- THE SCRAPTOFT VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN SIDNEY POULTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY STEKE | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
P STATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE CAROL POULTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.45k | £22.64k | £12.43k | £8.49k | £12.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.64k | £11.89k | £17.99k | £6.94k | £11.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/06/1991 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1998 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/08/2011
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF SCRAPTOFT.
Area of benefit
SCRAPTOFT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Rose Acre Close
Scraptoft
Leicester
LE7 9UH
- Phone:
- 01162414131
- Email:
- yvonne_poulton@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window