BRITISH POLICE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Orchestra made up of police officers, police staff and other members of the extended police family each year performs at different venues around the country raising money for a number of different charities. A mini tour of India took place in February 2008. Charity Concerts included Warwick Arts Centre for Fighting Blindness and the annual Proms Concert at Symphony Hall in December.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 1991: Standard registration
- BPSO (Working name)
- POLICE NATIONAL ORCHESTRA AND CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Lewis Guildford | Chair | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Welsted | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Boyle | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Brown | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Mellor | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Chandler | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikolas Adams | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damazer Damazer JP DL | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marion Dunn | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Victoria Burnell | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAUL WEST | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR JOHN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.38k | £21.39k | £69.67k | £76.80k | £67.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.29k | £11.21k | £69.74k | £77.30k | £72.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/06/1991 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2015
Charitable objects
A. TO PROVIDE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. B. TO MAKE DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BPSO
PO Box 306
NANTWICH
CW5 9EN
- Phone:
- 07813095953
- Email:
- sec@bpso.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window