Accounts and annual returns ABBEY PARK FIRST AND NURSERY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1003568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 July 2024 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 July 2024 725 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required