Financial history ABBEY PARK FIRST AND NURSERY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1003568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £9.26k £3.28k £3.17k £2.20k £7.97k
Total expenditure £3.04k £6.72k £3.76k £2.28k £7.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A