Accounts and annual returns FIRST STEP NORTH EAST

Charity number: 1003569
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 March 2023 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 March 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 March 2022 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download Open in new window