Accounts and annual returns THE DALE TRUST

Charity number: 1003573
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 27 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 19 December 2010 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 13 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 15 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required