Trustees MONKS KIRBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1003574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Ann Woolridge Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Glynis Washington Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
Alison Sarah Champness-Comley Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
Simone Emma Collins Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Nia Haf Evans Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
KAREN LAWLOR Trustee 12 January 2016
None on record
Sarah Hicks Trustee 12 May 2015
None on record
LOUISE ANN PARTRIDGE Trustee 03 June 2011
None on record