SUPPORTERS OF THE ICP

Charity number: 1003623
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004

Total income: £5,010
Total expenditure: £7,369

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 1991: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • THE SUPPORTERS (Working name)
  • SUPPORTERS OF THE GENERAL PRACTICE SURGERY, THE OLD COTTAGE HOSPITAL, EPSOM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004
Total gross income £5.01k
Total expenditure £7.37k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 11 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required