WILMINGTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for Wilmington Grammar School for Boys Parent Teachers Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £21,859
Total expenditure: £10,681

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Selina Westerman Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Rosanna Mazzilli Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Surein Rheeder Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.77k £7.44k £8.00k £12.40k £21.86k
Total expenditure £6.05k £9.05k £7.36k £5.27k £10.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 November 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wilmington Grammar
Wilmington Hall
Common Lane
DARTFORD
DA2 7DA
Phone:
01322223090
Website:

No information available