Financial history SOMERSET CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity number: 1003687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.03k £12.15k £10.32k £31.22k £35.71k
Total expenditure £33.03k £4.38k £14.77k £29.33k £28.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A