THE HARVEY ROAD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the Parent Teachers Association of Harvey Road School. We raise money to help support the school and provide equipment and extra-curricula activities for the benefit of all children at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 August 1991: Standard registration
- H R S A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICK ROWLANDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Wendy Iveson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Glover | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clair Tustin | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.29k | £12.77k | £6.68k | £18.71k | £18.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.64k | £17.23k | £2.02k | £17.26k | £19.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH. OCTOBER 1976, AMENDED 15TH. APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
(A)DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. (B)ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING IT. (C)PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL(NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HARVEY ROAD SCHOOL,CROXLEY GREEN,HERTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARVEY ROAD PRIMARY SCHOOL
HARVEY ROAD
CROXLEY GREEN
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 3BN
- Phone:
- 01923773801
- Email:
- head@harveyroad.herts.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window