ST EDMUNDS WARD COMMUNITY HALL

Charity Number: 1003707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST EDMUNDS WARD GLASTONBURY IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,839
Total expenditure: £12,401

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Xxxx Lokabandhu Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Dr Serena Roney-Dougal Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
MR JON COUSINS Trustee 09 May 2015
THE GLASTONBURY PEOPLE'S TRUST
Received: On time
GLASTONBURY MENTAL HEALTH NETWORK
Received: On time
GLASTONBURY AND DISTRICT CHARITY
Received: On time
Councillor NICK COTTLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.69k £64.68k £10.12k £9.71k £8.84k
Total expenditure £3.46k £42.65k £38.84k £7.28k £12.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £64.00k £3.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 March 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 March 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2023 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2023 354 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2022 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GLASTONBURY TOWN COUNCIL
TOWN HALL
MAGDALENE STREET
GLASTONBURY
BA6 9EL
Phone:
01458831769
Website:

No information available