Accounts and annual returns RALPH ALLEN SCHOOL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1003754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 March 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required