Accounts and annual returns ROYAL GREEN JACKETS WAR MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1003773
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 29 November 2006 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 29 November 2006 29 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 07 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 23 August 2005 On Time