Financial history FERENS ART GALLERY

Charity number: 1003774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £218.09k £173.53k £155.56k £169.56k £228.14k
Total expenditure £276.42k £293.16k £285.28k £296.20k £345.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A