FERENS ART GALLERY

Charity number: 1003774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY FOR THE EXHIBITION OF WORKS OF ART IN PERPETUITY AND THE PURCHASE OF WORKS OF ART FOR EXHBITION THEREIN.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £228,142
Total expenditure: £345,533

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Hull City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • FERENS ENDOWMENT FUND (Working name)
  • FERENS GIFT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kingston upon Hull City Council Trustee
ALDERMAN RUPERT ALEC-SMITH FUND FOR THE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £218.09k £173.53k £155.56k £169.56k £228.14k
Total expenditure £276.42k £293.16k £285.28k £296.20k £345.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 15 MARCH 1928
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE ANNUAL COST OF MAINTENANCE UPKEEP AND USUAL EXPENSES OF AND IN CONNECTION WITH THE ART GALLERY IN DEFRAYING THE COSTS OF ACQUIRING ANY PICTURES STATUARY OR OTHER WORKS OF EFFECT WHICH THE CORPORATION OR ANY COMMITTEE OF THE CORPORATION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM IT DESIRABLE TO ACQUIRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF EXHIBITION IN THE SAID GALLERY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 05 August 1991 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
CORPORATE FINANCE
CITY TREASURY
HULL CITY COUNCIL
GUILDHALL ROAD
HULL
HU1 2AB
Phone:
01482613282
Website:

No information available