THE BERKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was established under a Deed of Trust and its objectives are to distribute investment income for the relief of local distress and charitable need of a Masonic or non-Masonic nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- Swindon
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 08 August 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas McGregor | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
John Palmer | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy Peter Lee | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
MR G J BARLOW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.39k | £71.61k | £77.50k | £82.00k | £100.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.94k | £60.69k | £86.45k | £94.34k | £74.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH. JULY 1991
Charitable objects
(A)TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG INHABITANTS OF AND VISITORS TO THE MASONIC PROVINCE OF BERKSHIRE. (B)TO SUPPORT AND PROVIDE FUNDS FOR ANY OTHER WHOLLY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION WHICH OPERATES TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS EITHER WHOLLY OR PARTLY WITHIN THE SAID MASONIC PROVINCE. (C)TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN THE SAID MASONIC PROVINCE. (D)GENERALLY TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS OR ORGANISATIONS AND TO CARRY OUT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE SAID MASONIC PROVINCE THAT MAY DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BENEFIT ALL OR SOME OF THE INHABITANTS OF OR VISITORS TO THAT PROVINCE. (E)TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED OR DEEDS EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Woodlands Avenue
Winnersh
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG41 3HL
- Phone:
- 07939170572
- Email:
- bmc@berkspgl.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window