Financial history BRIGHTON WOMEN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1003790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £438.88k £691.08k £796.35k £912.36k £1.45m
Total expenditure £490.41k £541.67k £742.31k £906.55k £1.25m
Income from government contracts £71.20k N/A £332.70k £638.00k £385.16k
Income from government grants N/A £170.74k £236.13k £28.00k £390.17k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £55.83k £23.68k £41.79k £278.86k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £30.77k £29.99k £22.15k £12.82k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £604.48k £742.65k £847.29k £1.15m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £1.14k £11.78k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £540.67k £704.60k £852.69k £1.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.00k £37.72k £53.86k £57.30k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.49k £0 £2.28k £6.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0