SHREE SHREE RADHA KRISHNA CULTURAL CENTRE (SOUTH LONDON)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre's main objects are that of promoting Vedic Dharma (religious) and cultural activities by Vedic literature and narrated by His Divine Grace A.C. Bhakhvedauta Swami Prabhupada.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 05 August 1991: Standard registration
- 13 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 13 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1157355 INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR KRISHNA CONSCIOUSNESS SO...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.34k | £40.94k | £11.05k | £1.69k | £169 | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.44k | £70.21k | £12.34k | £473 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF VEDIC DHARMA (RELIGION) AS DESCRIBED IN THE PUBLICATIONS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR KRISHNA CONSCIOUSNESS. (11) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN INDIAN AND/OR VEDIC HISTORY, CULTURE, LANGUAGES, CUSTOMS AND WAY OF LIFE. (111) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISTRESS OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HANDICAP. (1V) THE PROVISION, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF YOUNG AND OLD PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, SOUTH LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window