THE HEYDOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees meet twice a year to consider requests from individuals and charities living or operating in the counties of Cornwall, Devon and Somerset. Their objectives will be in community projects, education, medical, health, disability, poverty relief and emergency aid. Please submit applications by email to Liz Williams in January and February or July and August.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 August 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby Richard Sharp | Chair | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Erica Clare Sturdy | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Geoffrey Axford | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Owen David Williams | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Joan Sharp | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
LIZ WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £30.89k | £19.34k | £27.10k | £32.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.40k | £14.98k | £25.30k | £27.46k | £19.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2025 | 342 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH. JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swallow Barn
Mitchel Troy
Monmouth
NP25 4HZ
- Phone:
- 01600711518
- Email:
- swallowbarn@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window