ALL HALLOWS HOUSE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping to improve the health and well-being of those who live and work in the City of London, by providing advice on health matters, maintaining a complementary and alternative health centre, and offering bursaries for treatments for those who could not otherwise afford them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 August 1991: Standard registration
- 24 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18k | £3.11k | £79.61k | £64.77k | £66.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £1.26k | £67.21k | £64.56k | £77.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION PRESERVATION AND SAFEGUARDING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND PRACTICE OF HOLISTIC MEDICINE AND PHILOSOPHY (2) THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF HEALTH EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING WITH REFERENCE TO THE NEEDS OF THE BUSINESS COMMUNITY (3) THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS AND INVALIDS WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window