Financial history BEXLEY TINNITUS SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1003815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £435 £2.99k £334 £348 £250
Total expenditure £423 £0 £412 £427 £573
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A