THE DENTISTS HEALTH SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity is to give advise and help to members of the Dental profession or dental students or associated workers in the profession who have drug or alcohol problems, or mental health problems as a result of drug or alcohol dependence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 August 1991: Standard registration
- THE SICK DENTIST TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Sonia Kumar | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Simon Lidster | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL LANGMAID CBE | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Janine Brooks MBE | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN ALEXANDER DUNCAN CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.45k | £92.39k | £100.73k | £125.52k | £140.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.32k | £90.88k | £70.08k | £81.59k | £64.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
1.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO DEFRAY THE COSTS OF THE OPERATION OF THE SICK DENTIST SCHEME OF THE BRITISH DENTAL ASSOCIATION2.ADVICE INFORMATION AND SUPPORT CONCERNING THE PROBLEMS OF DRUG AND ALCOHOL ABUSE TO THE DENTAL PROFESSION.3.TO ASSIST CONSULT AND CO-OPERATE WITH AGENCIES AND BODIES HAVING PURPOSES SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE SICK DENTISTS' SCHEME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hillcote Drive
SHEFFIELD
S10 3PJ
- Phone:
- 07720773951
- Email:
- sglidster@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window