Financial history SUNNYHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.53k £29.66k £24.32k £24.22k £30.36k
Total expenditure £33.37k £14.68k £28.53k £28.53k £48.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £11.75k £1.00k N/A N/A