PIMLICO OPERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pimlico aims to use music and drama to advance personal development, particularly with younger people. Artistic excellence is an essential part of achieving this A different production is staged in an English prison periodically and a project started in 2013 in schools using music and theatre to expand the outlook and enrich the lives of schoolchildren who have little exposure to songs and music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 August 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Meagher | Chair | 15 February 2024 |
|
|||||
John Griffith Derrick | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Uttley | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Anderson | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lady Isabella Mary Alexandra Murray | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalya Zeman | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Farr | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £306.76k | £411.47k | £142.08k | £140.35k | £469.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.41k | £290.87k | £71.78k | £175.46k | £454.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/06/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION,SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND DRAMA(INCLUDING OPERA,MUSIC,DRAMA,DANCING SINGING AND ALL FORMS CONSTITUTING IN WHOLE OR IN PART OF MUSIC) AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION,ENCOURAGEMENT AND APPRECIATION OF OPERA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sutton Manor Farm
Bishop's Sutton Road
ALRESFORD
SO24 0AA
- Phone:
- 01962 737373
- Email:
- info@grangeparkopera.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window