SRI DATTA YOGA CENTRE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of multifaith and brotherhood of love and peace, Promotion of meditation & healing music, Yoga teaching of Guru Dattatreya, Laughter yoga, Kriya yoga, Celebrations of festivals of all faiths, Teaching and promotion of Veda esp Bhagavata gita and Guru Gita. Preservation of ancient rituals and promotion of healthy living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 1991: Standard registration
- EURO DATTA CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANUBHAI PATEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chaitanya Prathima Gonuguntla | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Venkata Raman Chennupati | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr UTTAM VETURI | Trustee | 14 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
BHAVNA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RAVI SUNKARA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JITU DAVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.08k | £161.93k | £129.67k | £182.25k | £247.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.07k | £132.88k | £130.41k | £111.23k | £150.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 June 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 June 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JULY 1990 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE SANATANA DHARMA-UNIVERSAL RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HINDU TEACHINGS OF SRI DATTATREYA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SRI DATTA YOGA CENTRE (UK)
EURO DATTA YOGA CHURCH CENTRE
51 BEECH AVENUE
BRENTFORD
MIDDLESEX
TW8 8NQ
- Phone:
- 07466334961
- Email:
- MAIL@dycuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window