THE MRS R J COLMAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES RELIEF IN NEED TO RETIRED CLERGY WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH AND TO THE WIDOWED DIVORCED OR LEGALLY SEPARATED SPOUSES OR SURVIVING CIVIL PARTNERS OF DECEASED CLERGY WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 1991: Standard registration
- THE COLMAN TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Michael Brydon | Chair | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Helen Grogutt | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen G F Earl | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Eleanor Faulkner | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Vaughan | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Timothy Bernard Charles Weston | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Angela Reynolds | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JENNIFER MARY VERE MA DIP ED | Trustee | 11 January 2002 |
|
|||||||
MR J W F HERRING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.96k | £13.33k | £14.03k | £15.06k | £16.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.67k | £16.22k | £17.87k | £7.08k | £17.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 16TH MARCH 1990 AS ALTERED OR AFFECTED BY SCHEMES DATED 19TH JUNE 1996 AND 9TH FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (1) FOR RELIEF IN NEED OF RETIRED CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS BENEFICIARIES) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED; (2) FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF BENEFICIARIES; (3) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES ARE UNABLE IN ANY ONE YEAR TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES THEY SHALL APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN OR TOWARDS THE RELIEF IN NEED OF WIDOWED SPOUSES OR SURVIVING CIVIL PARTNERS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH; AND (4) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES ARE UNABLE IN ANY ONE YEAR TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES THEY MAY APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN OR TOWARDS THE RELIEF IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF: (A) DIVORCED OR LEGALLY SEPARATED SPOUSES; OR (B) DISSOLVED OR LEGALLY SEPARATED CIVIL PARTNERS OF MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF NORWICH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Aldwych House
57 Bethel Street
Norwich
Norfolk
NR2 1NW
- Phone:
- 01603812610
- Email:
- mandpgray11@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window