Denmark Road High School Parent Staff Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTA objectives are to: a. Develop more extended relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. b. Engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it. c. Provide and assist in the provision of facilities for education at the school (not normally provided by the LEA).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 August 1991: Standard registration
- HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRL PARENT TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS, GLOUCESTER PARENT TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS PARENTS'ASSOCIATION AND FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prabhjeet Kaur | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Threadgold | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Louise Coates | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Bridgett Powell | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Annette Giblin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.83k | £15.53k | £29.13k | £4.92k | £5.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.92k | £21.85k | £925 | £2.44k | £3.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUN 1991 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2017 as amended on 30 Sep 2019 as amended on 30 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Denmark Road High School
Denmark Road
Gloucester
GL1 3JN
- Phone:
- 01452543335
- Email:
- pta@denmarkroad.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window