Financial history UNITED KINGDOM ASSOCIATION FOR THE DOCUMENTATION AND CONSERVATION OF BUILDINGS, SITES AND NEIGHBOURHOODS OF THE MODERN MOVEMENT

Charity number: 1003997
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £7.20k £4.24k £2.71k £5.07k £6.09k
Total expenditure £5.81k £5.53k £4.12k £4.77k £7.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A