Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF LEOMINSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 1004001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.86k £512 £5.40k £1.08k £3.73k
Total expenditure £7.04k £5.65k £1.02k £525 £562
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A