LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ARCLID HOSPITAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 30 August 1991: Standard registration
- 10 May 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 AUGUST 1991 AS AMENDED 9 JUNE 1993.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL OR THE REPLACEMENT NURSING HOMES AT CREWE AND ELWORTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window