THE HARRY SIMPSON MEMORIAL LIBRARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 September 1991: Standard registration
- HOUSING RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE RT HON SIR GEORGE YOUNG BT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIM COULTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR DESMOND LORIMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY F COLLINSON O B E | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN HOUSING AND ITS SOCIAL ASPECTS AND RELATED MATTERS BY PROVIDING A LIBRARY AND RESOURCE ORGANISATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winckworth Sherwood Llp
Minerva House
3-5 Montague Close
London
SE1 9BB
- Phone:
- 02075935000
- Email:
- andrewjmurray@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window