BRIDGEND COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of transport services for people who have a special need for such a service because they are: disabled; infirm; elderly; by reason of financial hardship hardship or social and economic circumstances; people with young children; young people; people living in isolated areas without adequate public transport. Voluntary and Charitable groups are also transport service beneficiaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £141,469 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 09 September 1991: Standard registration
- OTED (Working name)
- OGWR TRANSPORT FOR ELDERLY OR DISABLED (Previous name)
- OTED TRANSPORT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE VIVIAN JENKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kerry Anne Lane | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CERI EDWARDS | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tudor Brent Parry | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.01k | £242.98k | £246.92k | £252.33k | £285.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.93k | £196.45k | £217.66k | £296.02k | £299.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £112.21k | £150.98k | £139.04k | £141.47k | £141.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/08/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/06/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR: (1) PERSONS WHO HAVE A SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE DISABLED, INFIRM, ELDERLY OR BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN; (2) YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE A NEED OF A TRANSPORT SERVICE SO THAT THEY MAY TAKE ADVANTAGE OF RECREATIONAL OR LEISURE FACILITIES DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (3) PERSONS LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVICES; AND (4) VOLUNTARY AND CHARITABLE GROUPS
Area of benefit
OGWR
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A Australian Terrace
Bridgend
Bridgend
CF31 1LY
- Phone:
- 01656669665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window