FREEDOM COACH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer advice on homelessness and how to avoid it and advice on what help is available and where from.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 05 September 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WALTER SCOTT MCGUIGAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA LILIAN AITMAN MCGUIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 26 AUGUST 1991
Charitable objects
(1)THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS OR OTHERWISE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND OTHER INNER CITY AREAS (2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ESPECIALLY AMONGST HOMELESS PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (3) TO HELP TO EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND OTHER INNER CITY AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 TOWNSEND COURT
ACKLINGTON
MORPETH
NE65 9DJ
- Phone:
- 01670760933
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window