Barkway Preschool

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School, providing early years education and day-care for children aged between 2 to 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £66,051 from 3 government contract(s) and £528 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 September 1991: Standard registration
- BARKWAY PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- BARKWAY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Katie Linard | Chair | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Anne Francis | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Louise Collicott | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Jane Williams | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Bond | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lee | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.62k | £79.75k | £92.71k | £88.89k | £127.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.13k | £67.23k | £87.27k | £96.99k | £120.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £51.40k | £46.58k | £65.41k | £53.49k | £66.05k | |
|
Income from government grants | £319 | N/A | £3.63k | £1.35k | £528 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH. MAY 1991 as amended on 25 Oct 2019 as amended on 27 Nov 2019 as amended on 04 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
2.0 AIMS 2.1 The aims of the Preschool are to advance the development and education of children under statutory school age by: a. offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, together with the right of parents or guardians (“Parents”) to take responsibility for and to become involved in activities; b. offering opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; c. encouraging other charitable activities through which Parents may help the children.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barkway Preschool
84 High Street
Barkway
ROYSTON
SG8 8EF
- Phone:
- 07964151288
- Website:
-
barkwaypreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window