SOUTH WEST ARTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 September 1991: Standard registration
- 30 September 2005: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 September 2005: Funds transferred to 1003505 SPIKE ISLAND ARTSPACE LIMITED
- SOUTH WEST ARTS (Working name)
- ARTS BOARD SOUTH WEST (Previous name)
- SOUTH WEST ARTS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 27 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH. JUNE 1991 AS AMENDED 20 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 6 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS IN SOCIETY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AVON,CORNWALL,DEVON,DORSET,GLOUCESTERSHIRE, & SOMERSET, & ELSEWHERE, BY DEVELOPING PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND BY IMPROVING PUBLIC ACCESS TO AND THE QUALITY OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
AVON,CORNWALL,DEVON,DORSET,GLOUCESTER,SOMERSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window