FLINTSHIRE OPTEC YOUTH EXCHANGE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve and advance education by arranging and funding exchange visits for young people to the towns of Kuga and Murata in Japan Promoting and fostering an understanding and appreciation of Japanese culture, education, commerce and recreation, and; to learn and practice the Japanese language; promote better international relations and friendship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Flintshire
Governance
- 10 September 1991: Standard registration
- 11 August 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1189857 THEATR CLWYD TRUST LTD
- THE OPTEC YOUTH EXCHANGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.21k | £6.42k | £4.98k | £4.96k | £2.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.59k | £21.60k | £22.30k | £21.59k | £6.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 14 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 19 APRIL 1999 AND 15 MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ARRANGING AND FUNDING EXCHANGE VISITS FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE TOWNS OF KUGA AND MURATA IN JAPAN
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF FLINTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window