WALLICH-CLIFFORD COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity as stated in the Memorandum and Articles of Association are the support of persons who are in need or who are homeless or who are suffering from psychological or physical probelms who are in need of help in acquiring a settled life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£17,988,699
Donations and legacies | £220.79k | |
Charitable activities | £17.70m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £66.59k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£19,588,863
Raising funds | £260.64k | |
Charitable activities | £19.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£227,064 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £12,389,388 from 53 government contract(s) and £1,327,939 from 14 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £260.64k | |
Charitable expenditure | £19.33m |
People

474 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
122 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 September 1991: Standard registration
- THE WALLICH (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Angharad Ellis | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Catherine Williams | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Rebecca Howells | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Arthur | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Taylor | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Ann McKibben | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Sian Hetenyi | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Benedict Townsend | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Polly Roisin Thompson | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Simon Christopher Moore | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Williams | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.37m | £16.97m | £18.46m | £18.90m | £17.99m | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.38m | £17.24m | £19.54m | £20.27m | £19.59m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.39m | £12.39m | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.67m | £10.56m | £12.04m | £1.45m | £1.33m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £526.35k | £611.79k | £382.35k | £321.90k | £220.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.88k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.74m | £16.30m | £17.67m | £17.88m | £17.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £94.83k | £54.87k | £53.15k | £67.85k | £66.59k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £363.63k | £629.42k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £270.00k | £0 | £0 | £18.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £15.18m | £17.09m | £19.23m | £20.02m | £19.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £195.94k | £148.01k | £314.46k | £252.84k | £260.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.61k | £11.06k | £15.52k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.94m | £4.40m | £4.11m | £3.11m | £3.08m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.77m | £3.36m | £3.57m | £3.41m | £3.13m | |
|
Other assets | £4.00m | £4.44m | £3.67m | £3.92m | £2.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.07m | £1.27m | £1.32m | £1.98m | £2.09m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JAN 2018 as amended on 07 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
'THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') (WHICH SHALL BE NON-SECTARIAN AND NON POLITICAL) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OR WHO ARE HOMELESS OR WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL OR PHYSICAL PROBLEMS OR WHO (BY REASON OF ADVERSE CIRCUMSTANCES, ILL HEALTH OR BEING AN EX-OFFENDER) ARE IN NEED OF HELP IN ACQUIRING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE; THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS TO GAIN ACCESS TO SERVICES APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS, SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; AND THE EDUCATION OF AND PROVISION OF LEISURE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY DEVELOP FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO EDUCATION, LEISURE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE FIELDS OF ARTS, CULTURE AND AMATEUR SPORT)'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wallich - Cardiff Hub
18 Park Place
CARDIFF
CF10 3DQ
- Phone:
- 02920668464
- Email:
- mail@thewallich.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window