LIFE TO ROMANIA FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fund helps to develop Christian work for children and youth in Romania in cooperation with churches, training and resourcing Romanian youth and children's leaders. UK teams visit Romania to model modern Christian youth work. We also provide practical, humanitarian and financial support to families, communities and other organisations where this contributes towards our charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Romania
Governance
- 11 September 1991: Standard registration
- CRUSADERS ROMANIA PROJECT (Working name)
- LIFE TO ROMANIA (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Saxton | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LIA MARIA CAMPBELL | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANITA MARY RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ANDREW PINKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.83k | £23.15k | £19.13k | £23.70k | £18.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.99k | £22.09k | £19.48k | £29.09k | £20.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF ROMANIA INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH.
Area of benefit
ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN ACRE
OCKHAM ROAD NORTH
WEST HORSLEY
LEATHERHEAD
KT24 6PF
- Phone:
- 01483283877
- Email:
- enquiries@life2romania.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window